U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-02013
  • Case Name: Andrade et al v. Nason-Hunter
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 27, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Pre-Trial Scheduling Order]
  • January 24, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Proceedings]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 17, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 17, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Order]
  • December 13, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • December 06, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 04, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • December 04, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss Party]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • November 21, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • November 15, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • November 15, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss Party]
  • November 14, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 19, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.