U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10554
  • Case Name: Anthony D Winchenbach
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2024
  • November 22, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allowing and Disallowing Claims]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • March 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Supplemental Document]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Notice of Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Notice of Hearing]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow and Disallow Claims]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
  • January 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • January 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
December, 2018
  • December 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Agreed Request for Continuance]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Certificate of Service]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
  • September 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.