U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00381
  • Case Name: PERRY et al v. FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Order]
  • July 23, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Certification of Issue to State Court]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • September 20, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: Removal of Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.