U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00384
  • Case Name: RICKARDS v. CORIZON HEALTH INC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Order]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Order on Objection]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: Removal of Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.