U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00294
  • Case Name: SMITH v. DAEDONG-USA INC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Order Dismissing Case]
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Order]
  • July 21, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • June 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • June 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Order]
  • July 23, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 18, 2019: [Report of Conference of Counsel and Order]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Conference of Counsel]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 23, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.