U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00413
  • Case Name: SEA SALT LLC v. BELLEROSE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Order]
  • September 13, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Writ Issued]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order]
  • April 12, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
February, 2021
  • February 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • February 02, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Order]
  • January 26, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Order]
  • October 13, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Writ Issued]
  • August 25, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Order]
  • July 14, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Order]
  • May 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • May 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order]
  • March 05, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • February 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 06, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Objection]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Judgment - Default]
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order on Objection]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order]
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • June 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Service]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • April 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Service]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
January, 2019
  • January 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • October 05, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: Removal of Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.