U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00377
  • Case Name: GALDO MELENDEZ v. PATRIAU
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 21, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.