U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00386
  • Case Name: US BANK TRUST NA v. HOGLUND
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Judgment of Foreclosure]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Final Pretrial Conference & Order]
  • December 11, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Order of Recusal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.