U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00412
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $483,855.52 IN US CURRENCY
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [Decree of Forfeiture]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Order]
  • January 22, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.