U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00329
  • Case Name: HAYER v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • May 14, 2019: [SS Statement of Errors/Fact Sheet]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protection from Trial]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: SS Appeals]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.