U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00432
  • Case Name: HAYDEN v. LIBERTY
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 12, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • August 12, 2020: [Order on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • October 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Order to Answer]
  • October 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.