U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00336
  • Case Name: MCCANN et al v. YORK SCHOOL DEPARTMENT et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 06, 2019: [SEALED Order]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Order]
  • May 20, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Order]
  • February 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
November, 2018
  • November 02, 2018: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.