U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10628
  • Case Name: Richard B. Sargent and Andrea D. Sargent
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • January 29, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Discharging Debtor]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Financial Management Course]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.