U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00395
  • Case Name: STEVENS et al v. MAINE NORTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Order]
  • July 02, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
  • November 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.