U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00289
  • Case Name: SHEA v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [Order]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Approval of Settlement]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 14, 2019: [SS Statement of Errors/Fact Sheet]
  • August 14, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: SS Appeals]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.