U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00479
  • Case Name: EVERETT v. CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Order]
  • March 16, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
  • February 10, 2021: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [Order]
  • December 04, 2020: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
April, 2019
  • April 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 19, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: Removal of Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.