U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00408
  • Case Name: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. WILLARD
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • August 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: [Order]
  • February 12, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.