U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00433
  • Case Name: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. SMITH et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Judgment of Foreclosure]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Order]
  • October 09, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • August 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Order]
  • April 22, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • February 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • January 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.