U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00264
  • Case Name: JOHNSON v. CITY OF BIDDEFORD POLICE DEPARTMENT et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Amend]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order]
  • July 28, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2019
  • May 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Approval of Local Rule 56(h) Schedule]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.