U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00482
  • Case Name: DEANE v. TRANSUNION LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 21, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: Removal of Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.