U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20667
  • Case Name: Danielle Michelle Giasson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Discharging Debtor]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Receipt of Installment Payment Final]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Amended Document]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Receipt of Installment Payment #3]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Receipt of Installment Payment #2]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Notice of Fees Due]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Entry]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Schedules and Statements]
  • December 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Receipt of Installment Payment #1]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Matrix]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Matrix]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Order to Comply]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.