U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00454
  • Case Name: YERRAMSETTY v. DUNKIN' DONUTS NORTHEAST INC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Approval of Local Rule 56(h) Schedule]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Order]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
  • January 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
  • December 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • December 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.