U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20669
  • Case Name: Virginia Figueroa
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Installment Payment (Final) (Chapter 07)]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • February 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Installment Payment #3 (Chapter 07)]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Installment Payment #2 (Chapter 07)]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.