U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10682
  • Case Name: Aaron David Paolino
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Discharging Debtor - Chapter 7 Asset]
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Relief from Stay Consented]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Proposed Order]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Proposed Order]
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Entry]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Relief from Stay Consented]
  • January 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Change of Address]
  • January 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • December 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.