U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20673
  • Case Name: Peter C. Nolette
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Change of Address]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • December 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.