U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20672
  • Case Name: CREATIVE TRAVEL, INC.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Change of Address]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • December 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset Business]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Document]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Document]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.