U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20676
  • Case Name: Jesse B Michaud
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
May, 2019
  • May 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Deduct Wages]
February, 2019
  • February 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Financial Management Course]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Notice of Hearing]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.