U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10685
  • Case Name: Susan P. Wheeler
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Discharging Debtor]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Reaffirmation Agreement Cover Sheet]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • December 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course]
  • December 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Financial Management Course]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.