U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00492
  • Case Name: SYMETRA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v. EMERSON
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Order]
  • May 14, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Order]
  • February 28, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 18, 2018: [Order]
  • December 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • December 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.