U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00548
  • Case Name: LEHMAN et al v. LOXTERKAMP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: [Order Dismissing Case]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • June 02, 2020: [Order]
  • June 02, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Order]
  • May 20, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 06, 2020: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
January, 2019
  • January 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • December 19, 2018: [Order of Recusal]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.