U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00472
  • Case Name: COFFIN v. AMETEK INC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Order]
  • September 25, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 16, 2020: [Order]
  • September 16, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
August, 2020
  • August 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Conference of Counsel]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.