U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00410
  • Case Name: HSBC BANK USA NA v. TAMIR
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order]
  • January 31, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.