U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00508
  • Case Name: FRANCO v. STATE OF MAINE
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Order to Answer]
  • December 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.