U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20718
  • Case Name: Colleen Gail Jillson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
December, 2018
  • December 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.