U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00351
  • Case Name: BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST v. PHOENIX et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • July 25, 2019: [Judgment - Default]
  • July 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order]
  • April 29, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Custodian]
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem]
  • March 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.