U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00471
  • Case Name: AURITT v. AURITT et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Bench Trial]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • March 25, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • March 03, 2021: [Final Pretrial Conference & Order]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 2]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order]
  • November 01, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 01, 2019: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 01, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Order]
  • September 17, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.