U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00500
  • Case Name: GILL v. THATCHER BROOK CENTER et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
April, 2019
  • April 11, 2019: [Order]
  • April 11, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.