U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00419
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. LINDSAY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Judgment]
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
  • June 02, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2019
  • May 03, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.