U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00214
  • Case Name: CAPERGY US LLC v. SAG REALTY LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.