U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00028
  • Case Name: KENDRICK v. MAINE MEDICAL CENTER et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 20, 2021: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Order]
  • August 05, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order]
  • June 30, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 30, 2021: [SEALED Order]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Order]
  • November 03, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
  • October 07, 2020: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Order]
  • December 27, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.