U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00045
  • Case Name: REYNOLDS v. ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Order]
  • January 28, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 16, 2020: [Report of Conference of Counsel and Order]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Removal of Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.