U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00041
  • Case Name: BENSON v. WAL-MART STORES EAST INC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Order]
  • October 16, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.