U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-10051
  • Case Name: Kathleen E. Finnegan and Timothy E. Harrison
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
April, 2019
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Document]
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Schedule J]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Schedule I]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order to Comply]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Order to Comply]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.