U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00366
  • Case Name: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. WILSON
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • May 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.