U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00055
  • Case Name: MACHIAS SAVINGS BANK v. ANNA & MALLORY F/V et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [Order]
  • December 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Custodian]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.