U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00016
  • Case Name: MILLER v. CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Approval of Settlement]
  • October 05, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
March, 2020
  • March 05, 2020: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
  • July 17, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.