U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00046
  • Case Name: BEERS v. MENTOR ABI LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Order]
  • July 17, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2019
  • June 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • March 18, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.