U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20041
  • Case Name: Maine Textiles International, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Close Adversary Case]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Transcript]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
March, 2019
  • March 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Amended Order]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order on Document]
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order on Document]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit List]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Witness List]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Witness List]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Document]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Change of Address]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Equity Security Holders]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Schedules and Statements]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order on Document]
  • March 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order on Document]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Cont]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Consent]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Shorten Time]
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Affidavit]
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit]
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Entry]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Affidavit]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • February 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order on Document]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Shorten Time]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Stay]
  • February 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • February 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 First Day Motions]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order on Document]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Affidavit]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Matrix]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 First Day Motions]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • February 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order to Comply]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.