open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maine

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maine
    Case Number:19-10059
    Party Name:Wallace L Osborne and Julie A Osborne
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:May 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor - Chapter 7 Asset]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Fees Due]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Order Vacating Order Waiving Filing Fee]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:March 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Avoid or strip Lien]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
    Date Published:February 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Hearing Set]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Entry]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Have Filing Fee Waived]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Avoid or Strip Lien]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.meb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?96009
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =