open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maine

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maine
    Case Number:19-20042
    Party Name:Richard A Fernald
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.meb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?96008
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =